Show Search Form
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Prime Minister: Staff | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, if he will publish a list of post-holders and the dates of service of the Military Assistants to the Prime Minister since 2010. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | Glasgow North | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 108257 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Honours | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, if he will make an assessment of the potential merits of introducing minimum qualifying criteria for a Prime Minister's tenure in office regarding resignation honours lists. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | Barnsley Central | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 108215 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Prime Minister: Government Chief Scientific Adviser | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, how many meetings (a) he and (b) his predecessors had with the Government Chief Scientific Adviser from (i) 1 December 2021 to 28 February 2022, (ii) 1 March to 31 May 2022 and (iii) 1 June to 31 August 2022. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | Tunbridge Wells | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 102796 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|