259206<\/a> on 6 June 2109.<\/p>"}
, "answeringMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/4060", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Sir Jake Berry"}
}
, "answeringMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "Rossendale and Darwen"}
, "answeringMemberPrinted" : {"_value" : "Jake Berry"}
, "dateOfAnswer" : {"_value" : "2019-06-20", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "isMinisterialCorrection" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "questionFirstAnswered" : [{"_value" : "2019-06-20T15:03:52.463Z", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
]}
, "answeringDeptId" : {"_value" : "7"}
, "answeringDeptShortName" : {"_value" : "Housing, Communities and Local Government"}
, "answeringDeptSortName" : {"_value" : "Housing, Communities and Local Government"}
, "date" : {"_value" : "2019-06-12", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "hansardHeading" : {"_value" : "Ministry of Housing, Communities and Local Government: Chief Scientific Advisers"}
, "houseId" : {"_value" : "1"}
, "legislature" : [{"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/terms/25259", "prefLabel" : {"_value" : "House of Commons"}
}
], "questionText" : "To ask the Secretary of State for Housing, Communities and Local Government, how many meetings he held with his Department\u2019s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019.", "registeredInterest" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "tablingMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1439", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Norman Lamb"}
}
, "tablingMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "North Norfolk"}
, "tablingMemberPrinted" : [{"_value" : "Norman Lamb"}
], "uin" : "263755"}
, {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131793", "AnsweringBody" : [{"_value" : "Ministry of Defence"}
], "answer" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131793/answer", "answerText" : {"_value" : "Between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019 - there have been no meetings between the Secretary of State for Defence and the Chief Scientific Adviser.<\/p>"}
, "answeringMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/4017", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Penny Mordaunt"}
}
, "answeringMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "Portsmouth North"}
, "answeringMemberPrinted" : {"_value" : "Penny Mordaunt"}
, "dateOfAnswer" : {"_value" : "2019-06-19", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "isMinisterialCorrection" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "questionFirstAnswered" : [{"_value" : "2019-06-19T15:22:33.79Z", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
]}
, "answeringDeptId" : {"_value" : "11"}
, "answeringDeptShortName" : {"_value" : "Defence"}
, "answeringDeptSortName" : {"_value" : "Defence"}
, "date" : {"_value" : "2019-06-12", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "hansardHeading" : {"_value" : "Ministry of Defence: Chief Scientific Advisers"}
, "houseId" : {"_value" : "1"}
, "legislature" : [{"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/terms/25259", "prefLabel" : {"_value" : "House of Commons"}
}
], "questionText" : "To ask the Secretary of State for Defence, how many meetings she held with her Department\u2019s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019.", "registeredInterest" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "tablingMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1439", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Norman Lamb"}
}
, "tablingMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "North Norfolk"}
, "tablingMemberPrinted" : [{"_value" : "Norman Lamb"}
], "uin" : "263756"}
, {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131794", "AnsweringBody" : [{"_value" : "Department for Digital, Culture, Media and Sport"}
], "answer" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131794/answer", "answerText" : {"_value" : "
The Secretary of State for Digital, Culture, Media and Sport has met with the department's Chief Scientific Adviser on four separate occasions between March and May this year.<\/p>"}
, "answeringMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/4115", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Margot James"}
}
, "answeringMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "Stourbridge"}
, "answeringMemberPrinted" : {"_value" : "Margot James"}
, "dateOfAnswer" : {"_value" : "2019-06-20", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "isMinisterialCorrection" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "questionFirstAnswered" : [{"_value" : "2019-06-20T11:53:16.41Z", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
]}
, "answeringDeptId" : {"_value" : "10"}
, "answeringDeptShortName" : {"_value" : "Digital, Culture, Media and Sport"}
, "answeringDeptSortName" : {"_value" : "Digital, Culture, Media and Sport"}
, "date" : {"_value" : "2019-06-12", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "hansardHeading" : {"_value" : "Department for Digital, Culture, Media and Sport: Chief Scientific Advisers"}
, "houseId" : {"_value" : "1"}
, "legislature" : [{"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/terms/25259", "prefLabel" : {"_value" : "House of Commons"}
}
], "questionText" : "To ask the Secretary of State for Digital, Culture, Media and Sport, how many meetings he held with his Department\u2019s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019.", "registeredInterest" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "tablingMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1439", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Norman Lamb"}
}
, "tablingMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "North Norfolk"}
, "tablingMemberPrinted" : [{"_value" : "Norman Lamb"}
], "uin" : "263757"}
, {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131795", "AnsweringBody" : [{"_value" : "Department for Education"}
], "answer" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131795/answer", "answerText" : {"_value" : "
My right hon. Friend, the Secretary of State for Education has not had any meetings with the Chief Scientific Adviser (CSA) between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019. The CSA\u2019s staff regularly attend meetings as required. The CSA regularly provides written advice to my right hon. Friend, Secretary of State for Education.<\/p>
<\/p>"}
, "answeringMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1523", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Anne Milton"}
}
, "answeringMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "Guildford"}
, "answeringMemberPrinted" : {"_value" : "Anne Milton"}
, "dateOfAnswer" : {"_value" : "2019-06-20", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "isMinisterialCorrection" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "questionFirstAnswered" : [{"_value" : "2019-06-20T09:04:39.437Z", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
]}
, "answeringDeptId" : {"_value" : "60"}
, "answeringDeptShortName" : {"_value" : "Education"}
, "answeringDeptSortName" : {"_value" : "Education"}
, "date" : {"_value" : "2019-06-12", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "hansardHeading" : {"_value" : "Department for Education: Chief Scientific Advisers"}
, "houseId" : {"_value" : "1"}
, "legislature" : [{"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/terms/25259", "prefLabel" : {"_value" : "House of Commons"}
}
], "questionText" : "To ask the Secretary of State for Education, how many meetings he held with his Department\u2019s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019.", "registeredInterest" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "tablingMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1439", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Norman Lamb"}
}
, "tablingMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "North Norfolk"}
, "tablingMemberPrinted" : [{"_value" : "Norman Lamb"}
], "uin" : "263758"}
, {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131796", "AnsweringBody" : [{"_value" : "Department for Environment, Food and Rural Affairs"}
], "answer" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131796/answer", "answerText" : {"_value" : "
The Secretary of State has had one bilateral meeting with Defra\u2019s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019. The Chief Scientific Adviser also regularly attends other Secretary of State meetings on wider issues.<\/p>
<\/p>"}
, "answeringMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1562", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Sir Robert Goodwill"}
}
, "answeringMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "Scarborough and Whitby"}
, "answeringMemberPrinted" : {"_value" : "Mr Robert Goodwill"}
, "dateOfAnswer" : {"_value" : "2019-06-21", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "isMinisterialCorrection" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "questionFirstAnswered" : [{"_value" : "2019-06-21T12:52:14.68Z", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
]}
, "answeringDeptId" : {"_value" : "13"}
, "answeringDeptShortName" : {"_value" : "Environment, Food and Rural Affairs"}
, "answeringDeptSortName" : {"_value" : "Environment, Food and Rural Affairs"}
, "date" : {"_value" : "2019-06-12", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "hansardHeading" : {"_value" : "Department for Environment, Food and Rural Affairs: Chief Scientific Advisers"}
, "houseId" : {"_value" : "1"}
, "legislature" : [{"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/terms/25259", "prefLabel" : {"_value" : "House of Commons"}
}
], "questionText" : "To ask the Secretary of State for Environment, Food and Rural Affairs, how many meetings he held with his Department\u2019s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019.", "registeredInterest" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "tablingMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1439", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Norman Lamb"}
}
, "tablingMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "North Norfolk"}
, "tablingMemberPrinted" : [{"_value" : "Norman Lamb"}
], "uin" : "263759"}
, {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131797", "AnsweringBody" : [{"_value" : "Department for Exiting the European Union "}
], "answer" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131797/answer", "answerText" : {"_value" : "
Between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019, the Secretary of State met with Chris Jones, Chief Scientific Adviser at DExEU during that period, on one occasion. It should be noted that this was a dual role for Chris Jones, and was combined with his position as the Director of Justice, Security and Migration.<\/p>"}
, "answeringMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/4366", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for James Cleverly"}
}
, "answeringMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "Braintree"}
, "answeringMemberPrinted" : {"_value" : "James Cleverly"}
, "dateOfAnswer" : {"_value" : "2019-06-19", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "isMinisterialCorrection" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "questionFirstAnswered" : [{"_value" : "2019-06-19T08:44:13.94Z", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
]}
, "answeringDeptId" : {"_value" : "203"}
, "answeringDeptShortName" : {"_value" : "Exiting the European Union "}
, "answeringDeptSortName" : {"_value" : "Exiting the European Union "}
, "date" : {"_value" : "2019-06-12", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "hansardHeading" : {"_value" : "Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers"}
, "houseId" : {"_value" : "1"}
, "legislature" : [{"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/terms/25259", "prefLabel" : {"_value" : "House of Commons"}
}
], "questionText" : "To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, how many meetings he held with his Department\u2019s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019.", "registeredInterest" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "tablingMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1439", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Norman Lamb"}
}
, "tablingMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "North Norfolk"}
, "tablingMemberPrinted" : [{"_value" : "Norman Lamb"}
], "uin" : "263760"}
, {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131798", "AnsweringBody" : [{"_value" : "Foreign and Commonwealth Office"}
], "answer" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/resources/1131798/answer", "answerText" : {"_value" : "
FCO Ministers offices have regular meetings with the Department's Chief Scientific Adviser, and her Deputy. I most recently met with the Chief Scientific Adviser on 16 October 2018.<\/p>"}
, "answeringMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1405", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Mark Field"}
}
, "answeringMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "Cities of London and Westminster"}
, "answeringMemberPrinted" : {"_value" : "Mark Field"}
, "dateOfAnswer" : {"_value" : "2019-06-17", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "isMinisterialCorrection" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "questionFirstAnswered" : [{"_value" : "2019-06-17T15:45:26.92Z", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
]}
, "answeringDeptId" : {"_value" : "16"}
, "answeringDeptShortName" : {"_value" : "Foreign and Commonwealth Office"}
, "answeringDeptSortName" : {"_value" : "Foreign and Commonwealth Office"}
, "date" : {"_value" : "2019-06-12", "_datatype" : "dateTime"}
, "hansardHeading" : {"_value" : "Foreign and Commonwealth Office: Chief Scientific Advisers"}
, "houseId" : {"_value" : "1"}
, "legislature" : [{"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/terms/25259", "prefLabel" : {"_value" : "House of Commons"}
}
], "questionText" : "To ask the Secretary of State for Foreign and Commonwealth Affairs, how many meetings he held with his Department\u2019s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019.", "registeredInterest" : {"_value" : "false", "_datatype" : "boolean"}
, "tablingMember" : {"_about" : "http://data.parliament.uk/members/1439", "label" : {"_value" : "Biography information for Norman Lamb"}
}
, "tablingMemberConstituency" : {"_value" : "North Norfolk"}
, "tablingMemberPrinted" : [{"_value" : "Norman Lamb"}
], "uin" : "263761"}
], "itemsPerPage" : 10, "next" : "http://eldaddp.azurewebsites.net/answeredquestions.text?date=2019-06-12&tablingMemberPrinted.=Norman+Lamb&_page=1", "page" : 0, "startIndex" : 1, "totalResults" : 20, "type" : ["http://purl.org/linked-data/api/vocab#ListEndpoint", "http://purl.org/linked-data/api/vocab#Page"]}
}