Show Search Form
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Prime Minister: Chief Scientific Advisers | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, how many meetings he had with his Department’s Chief Scientific Adviser from 1 June to 31 August 2019. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 292159 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Prime Minister: Chief Scientific Advisers | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, how many meetings she held with her Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 263769 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Prime Minister: Chief Scientific Advisers | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, how many meetings she held with her Department’s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 December 2018 and 28 February 2019. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 230064 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Prime Minister: Government Chief Scientific Adviser | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, how many meetings she had with the Government’s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 September and 30 November 2018. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 198748 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Prime Minister: Government Chief Scientific Adviser | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, how many meetings she had with the Government's Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 January and 31 March 2018. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 147380 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Prime Minister: Government Chief Scientific Adviser | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, how many meetings she had with the Government Chief Scientific Adviser between October and December 2017. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 124390 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 23 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Prime Minister | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Prime Minister: Government Chief Scientific Adviser | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Prime Minister, how many meetings she has had with the Government Chief Scientific Adviser in the last three months. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 105177 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|