Show Search Form
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 11 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Defence | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Defence | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Ministry of Defence: Chief Scientific Advisers | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Defence, how many meetings he had with his Department's Chief Scientific Adviser from (a) 1 March to 31 May 2021, (b) 1 June to 31 August 2021 and (c) 1 September to 30 November 2021. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | Tunbridge Wells | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 120700 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 11 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Defence | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Defence | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Ministry of Defence: Chief Scientific Advisers | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Defence, how many meetings he had with his Department’s Chief Scientific Adviser (a) from 1 September to 30 November 2019 and (b) from 1 December 2019 to 29 February 2020. | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | Tunbridge Wells | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 48358 | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|