Show Search Form
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, how many meetings he had with his Department’s Chief Scientific Adviser from 1 June to 31 August 2019. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 292153 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, how many meetings he held with his Department’s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 March 2019 and 31 May 2019. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 263760 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, how many meetings he held with his Department’s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 December 2018 and 28 February 2019. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 230041 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, how many meetings (a) he and (b) his predecessor had with his Department’s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 September and 30 November 2018. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 197600 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, how many meetings he had with his Department’s Chief Scientific Adviser between 1 January and 31 March 2018. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 147378 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, how many meetings he held with his Department’s Chief Scientific Adviser between October and December 2017. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 124388 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, pursuant to the Answer of 14 September 2017 to Question 9857, if he will provide an update on the appointment of a Chief Scientific Adviser to his Department. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | Barnsley Central | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 110010 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, what plans he has to appoint a Chief Scientific Adviser. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | North Norfolk | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 105173 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, if his Department will appoint a chief scientific advisor. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | Newcastle upon Tyne Central | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 9857 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|
registered interest | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
date | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering body |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept id | 203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept short name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answering dept sort name | Exiting the European Union | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
hansard heading | Department for Exiting the European Union: Chief Scientific Advisers | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
house id | 1 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
legislature |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
question text | To ask the Secretary of State for Exiting the European Union, if he plans to appoint a Chief Science Adviser prior to the opening of the negotiations on the UK leaving the EU. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member constituency | Barnsley Central | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member printed |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
uin | 65659 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
answer |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
tabling member |
|